Sreenivasan, Barathi Rajasri (CPSO#: 72426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone: 4162266780
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARATHI RAJASRI SREENIVASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SREENIVASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004