Sreenivasan, Uma (CPSO#: 46637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015