Sreerama, Venkataswamappa (CPSO#: 42642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 May 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1997