Sridhar, Jami (CPSO#: 83774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Oriya, Telugu

Education:Maharaja Krishna Chandra Gajapati Medica, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellton Regional Hospital
189 Lilylake Road
Campbellton NB  E3N 3H3
Phone: (506) 789-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
New Brunswick

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMI SRIDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIDHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2005 to 25 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2007 to 14 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018