Sridhar, Krishnakumar (CPSO#: 58222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3474
Fax: (519) 663-2997
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Sridhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sridhar ( CPSO# 58222 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
C6-123 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3474

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNAKUMAR SRIDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIDHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1989