Sridhar, Subbaramiah (CPSO#: 68499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Gastroenterology
Augusta University
1120 15th Street
Augusta GA  30912-3120
United States
Phone: (706) 721-2238
Fax: (706) 721-0331

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBBARAMIAH SRIDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIDHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1996