Srigley, Jocelyn Andyss (CPSO#: 84706)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jocelyn Srigley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: BC Children's Hospital Laboratory Medicine Room 2J3 4500 Oak Street Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015