Sritharan, Shivani (CPSO#: 109394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 22 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIVANI SRITHARAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SRITHARAN is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SRITHARAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SRITHARAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SRITHARAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SRITHARAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SRITHARAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Oct 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018