Srivamadevan, Maheswaran (CPSO#: 74886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 751-2941
Fax: (905) 751-0107
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

107 Holland Street East,
Suite 203
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Canada
Phone: 905 551 2944
Fax: 877 552 9250
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Srivamadevan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Srivamadevan ( CPSO# 74886 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Suites 301 and 303
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 751-2941

Business Address:
80 Holland Street East
PO Box 1361
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Phone Number: (905) 551-2944

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHESWARAN SRIVAMADEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIVAMADEVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004