Srivastava, Amresh Kumar (CPSO#: 85793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Indore University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute MHC Building
Room F 467
550 Wellington Ro
London ON N6C 0A7
London ON  N5P 3V9
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47107
Fax: (519) 631-2512
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amresh Kumar Srivastava may practice medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, formally affiliated
                        with the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Srivastava holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Srivastava
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.