Srour, Nadim (CPSO#: 88562)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 3120 Boulevard Taschereau Greenfield Park, Quebec J4V 2H1 Tel: (514) 465-4606
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 10 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013