St George-Hyslop, Peter Henry (CPSO#: 31657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tanz Centre for Research
in Neurodegenerative Diseases
6th Floor 6KD417
60 Leonard Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 507-6861
Fax: (416) 507-6435
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop ( CPSO# 31657 )
Dr. V. Fried ( CPSO# 50598 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 962-2273

Business Address:
Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 507-6861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HENRY ST GEORGE-HYSLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST GEORGE-HYSLOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980