Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

St-Amand, Marc Alain (CPSO#: 62221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hosiptal
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32883
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutnik St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2014


Corporation Name: Marc St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. St-Amand ( CPSO# 62221 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ALAIN ST-AMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-AMAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991