Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Staab, Randolf Albert (CPSO#: 68274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Suite 2411
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4505
Fax: (905) 813-4284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Randolf A. Staab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Staab ( CPSO# 68274 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Suite 2411
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDOLF ALBERT STAAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAAB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1999