Stables, Sabrina Michelle (CPSO#: 56879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 539-9598
Fax: (416) 539-0802
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABRINA MICHELLE STABLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STABLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987