Stadnyk, Alexander Nestor (CPSO#: 53078)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991