Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stafford, Alexander John (CPSO#: 56306)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University College, Cork, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994