Stafford, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 26323)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Women's College Hospital 76 Grenville Street Toronto, ON M5S 1B1
Date Received: 25 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014