Stait-Gardner, Lia Zane (CPSO#: 63586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lia Stait-Gardner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stait-Gardner ( CPSO# 63586 )

Business Address:
100 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIA ZANE STAIT-GARDNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAIT-GARDNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992