Stakheiko, Antonina (CPSO#: 91300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Gomel State Medical Institute, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 969-8448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antonina Stakheiko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stakheiko ( CPSO# 91300 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONINA STAKHEIKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAKHEIKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014