Stakiw, Julie Leigh-Ann (CPSO#: 81236)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Stakiw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 12 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2010