Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stal, Jeffrey Michael (CPSO#: 65438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Room 3407
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7543
Fax: (416) 323-7549
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MICHAEL STAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1993