Stamler, Christopher John (CPSO#: 93118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wawa Family Health Team
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Fax: (705) 856-9550
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Stamler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stamler ( CPSO# 93118 )

Business Address:
Wawa Family Health Team
Wawa Medical Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN STAMLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAMLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012