Stamp, Gary William (CPSO#: 58024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellington Ortho and Rehab
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: (226) 706-1501
Fax: (519) 821-8872
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Stamp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stamp ( CPSO# 58024 )

Business Address:
Wellington Ortho and Rehab
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (226) 706-1501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY WILLIAM STAMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAMP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988