Stampien, Deetta Mae (CPSO#: 62349)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Mazinke, Deetta Mae (used until: 27 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1999