Standen, James Ronald (CPSO#: 17571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2005