Staniloiu, Angelica (CPSO#: 77136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oberbergklinik
Oberberg 1
Hornberg 78132
Germany
Phone: +49(0)7833792 Ext. 233
Fax: +(49)783379282

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Health Records Department Tel: (416) 480-4433, OR Centre for Addiction and Mental Health Health Records-Release of Information Department Ground Floor Room G41 250 College Street Toronto ON M5T 1R8 Tel: (416) 535-8501 ext. 32318 Email: health.records@camh.ca (only use to submit request forms) Fax: (416) 979-6934
Instructions: A copy of Psychiatry clinical notes and records of previous patients will be maintained by the Department of Psychiatry at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre and Centre for Addiction and Mental Health. Should a former patient require a copy of her or his medical reports, this may be obtained through contacting Health Records Department at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre. For patients seen at the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health contact the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Date Received: 06 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELICA STANILOIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANILOIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2001 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003