Stanley, Gillian Therese (CPSO#: 62577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Names: Stevens, Gillian Therese (used until: 11 Jun 2012 )     Stanley, Gillian Therese (used until: 14 Aug 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Burlington Medical Centre
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 319-2000
Fax: (905) 319-6292
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Stanley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stanley ( CPSO# 62577 )

Business Address:
North Burlington Medical Centre
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN THERESE STANLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991