Stanton, William Thomas Hayes (CPSO#: 60682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone: (905) 842-2174
Fax: (905) 842-8071
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stanton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Stanton ( CPSO# 60682 )

Business Address:
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone Number: (905) 842-2174

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM THOMAS HAYES STANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990