Stapleton, Andrew Jay (CPSO#: 27332)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. J. Stapleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 1108 152 High Street Sutton ON L0E 1R0
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016