Stark, David Gilbert (CPSO#: 62542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 988-1933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David G. Stark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stark ( CPSO# 62542 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 934-7000

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients should contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 ext 1 to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 22 Feb 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GILBERT STARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1991