Starkell, Ginette (CPSO#: 59747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: Lajoie, Ginette (used until: 11 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Laboratory S3 461
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58706
Fax: (905) 494-6622
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Starkell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Starkell ( CPSO# 59747 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Laboratory S3 461
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINETTE STARKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARKELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1990