Starkey, Karen Anne (CPSO#: 64083)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007