Starr, David Michael (CPSO#: 52779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Yeomans Road
North York ON  M3H 3J9
Phone: (416) 749-2332
Fax: (416) 749-9712
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David M. Starr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Starr ( CPSO# 52779 )

Business Address:
150 Yeomans Road
North York ON  M3H 3J9
Phone Number: (416) 749-2332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 22, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Michael Starr,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Starr to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of
                  
                                    DR. DAVID MICHAEL STARR
                                                ("Dr. Starr")
                  
                                                       to 
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Starr, certificate of registration number 52779, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice, specifically that I performed the wrong surgery on a
                  patient.

            (2)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation.

            (3)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action on the Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor, who works at an institution other than one
                        where I have privileges, and who is acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review, every three months, 20 patient charts, consents,
                              confirmation in my dictated operative notes that I have
                              satisfied myself that surgical safety checklists have been
                              completed, as well as a log of surgical time-out for every
                              surgery that I will maintain.
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns arising from the reviews above;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;  
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Starr, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Starr, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Starr, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Starr, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        Certificate of Registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the ICR
                        Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section
                        (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (8)   I, Dr. Starr, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                        acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                        Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                        incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations
                        to the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Starr, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Starr was the subject of a College investigation. As a result
                        of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Starr will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Starr's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Starr, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of my Clinical Supervision, and/or
                  Assessments:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Starr, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: November 22, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Michael Starr to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 22, 2015:

Dr. Starr was the subject of a College investigation. As a result of the investigation:

•Dr. Starr will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

•Dr. Starr’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.