Starr, Joseph Auby (CPSO#: 19693)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014