Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Starr, Philip Alan John (CPSO#: 16505)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990