Staunton, Thomas Gerard (CPSO#: 53756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 09 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2008