Stavel, Miroslav (CPSO#: 101341)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2015