Stavrakaki, Chrissoula (CPSO#: 42355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Names: Stavrakaki-Mintsioulis, Chrissoula (used until: 09 Mar 2006 )     Stavrakaki, Chrissoula Stylianides (used until: 10 Dec 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
513 Leimerk Court
Manotick ON  K4M 0E8
Phone: (613) 692-3917
Fax: (613) 692-4167
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chrissoula Stavrakaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stavrakaki ( CPSO# 42355 )

Business Address:
513 Leimerk Court
Manotick ON  K4M 0E8
Phone Number: (613) 692-3917

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISSOULA STAVRAKAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAVRAKAKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1991