Steele, Alexander Angus (CPSO#: 24783)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Steele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre 50 College Drive North Bay, ON P1B 0A5
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016