Steele, Brian Thomas (CPSO#: 31792)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 107 King Street West Dundas ON L9H 1V1
Date Received: 06 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016