Steele, Leah Sharon (CPSO#: 70068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Methadone Works
Main Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 392-0520
Fax: (416) 392-0810
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

909 Queen St, East,
Toronto ON  M4M 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 466-2694
Fax: (416) 466-0403
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

795 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P5
Canada
Phone: (416) 519-5747
Fax: (416) 519-4590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leah Steele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Steele ( CPSO# 70068 )

Business Address:
Methadone Works
Main Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone Number: (416) 392-0520

Business Address:
909 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 466-2694

Business Address:
795 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 519-5745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH SHARON STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998