Steele, Linda Geraldine Mary (CPSO#: 31289)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Vail, Linda Geraldine Mary (used until: 19 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For patients seen in the last 15 years please contact South Huron Hospital, 24 Huron Street West, Exeter, ON N0M 1S2 Previous to that records can be located at the office of Dr. K. Fatum, 469 William Street, Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015