Steele, Liora Rebecca (CPSO#: 67811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7 Francis Street
P O Box 790
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ritz Lutheran Villa
4118A Rd 164
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Canada
Phone: (519) 348-8612
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Steele ( CPSO# 67811 )
Dr. I. Rusen ( CPSO# 65529 )

Business Address:
PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 348-8402

Business Address:
112 Avon Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5N7
Phone Number: (519) 273-1576

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIORA REBECCA STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1996