Steele, Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 58550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Janeway Room 4J129
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St John's NL  A1S 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-4197
Fax: (709) 722-0408

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET MARY STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988