Steele, Robert (CPSO#: 18249)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008