Steen, Andrea Rose (CPSO#: 60867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 253-9116
Fax: (519) 253-5404
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519)257-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Steen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steen ( CPSO# 60867 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
2 - 1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 253-9116

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
Index Medical
187 - 13300 Tecumseh Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4R4
Phone Number: (519) 979-0008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA ROSE STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1990