Steen, Charles Alan Edward (CPSO#: 29341)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013