Steen, Oren (CPSO#: 90537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes & Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oren Steen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lipszyc ( CPSO# 103281)
Dr. O. Steen ( CPSO# 90537 )

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes & Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OREN STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014