Steen, Rebecca Evans (CPSO#: 74910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Steen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Steen ( CPSO# 74910 )

Business Address:
Grant River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W6
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
Dundurn Medical
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 528-5480

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Brampton Women's Clinic
602 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 789-7474

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA EVANS STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002